Financial history KURDISH AND MIDDLE EASTERN WOMEN'S ORGANISATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1137055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £164.50k £404.30k £296.40k £552.86k £550.46k
Total expenditure £153.84k £239.10k £276.77k £363.30k £386.84k
Income from government contracts £53.95k £151.54k N/A £154.15k N/A
Income from government grants £53.95k £33.89k £169.35k £200.20k £283.86k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £552.86k £550.46k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £363.30k £386.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0