WIMBOTSHAM AND STOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall for use by the community. Available for hire for clubs, parties, family events, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Fendley | Chair | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Goodrum | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Penn | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cable | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.92k | £12.39k | £5.98k | £6.21k | £4.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £4.47k | £4.03k | £4.04k | £9.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 27 NOVEMBER 1951
Charitable objects
THE SAID PROPERTY (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE TRUST' PREMISES) SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF STOW BARDOLPH AND WIMBOTSHAM IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THESE PRESENTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF STOW BARDOLPH AND WIMBOTSHAM IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wimbotsham & Stow Village Hall
Low Road
Wimbotsham
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE34 3QQ
- Phone:
- 07876473896
- Email:
- wimbotshamhall@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window