Financial history THETFORD DISS AND MILDENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1132521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £349.06k £99.56k £128.75k £128.75k £150.84k
Total expenditure £197.31k £154.73k £216.96k £216.96k £162.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £300 N/A N/A