THETFORD DISS AND MILDENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The circuit produces a quarterly preaching plan to ensure regular acts of worship take place at each of the 13 Methodist churches in each geographical area. These are open to all people without charge. Work within the community supporting local needs and charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

40 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
40 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DVID ELY | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gary John Peachey | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Chris White | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Donna Joy Ely | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ken Nicholls | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA LOUISE SPENCER | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CHRISTINE STANLEY | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN BOLTON | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev HEATHER ANN SORRELL | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev HAROLD EDGAR WILKINSON | Trustee | 02 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARGARET NOBLE | Trustee | 02 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUSSELL WEBBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA ROSE JOBES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARGARET LITTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET ALICE BROWNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN ASPINALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY SYLVIA ASHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID NOEL SAVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DORTHY JOAN SCARFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV COLIN HOUGH BD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE ANNE BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN AUDREY SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RITA IVY PETHERWICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THELMA MARION SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NEVILLE HODSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY BENJAMIN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MERVYN JOHN CATER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VIVIEN OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE PATRICIA WEIBEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAZEL JOYCE CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUSSELL RAYMOND SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAY STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA ELIZABETH WOOLLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CAMERON BROWNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVIS ELIZABETH WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS BETTY PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA WITHERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £349.06k | £99.56k | £128.75k | £128.75k | £150.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.31k | £154.73k | £216.96k | £216.96k | £162.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £300 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 February 2023 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
01 February 2023 | 216 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THETFORD METHODIST CHURCH
TANNER STREET
THETFORD
IP24 2BQ
- Phone:
- 01842753819
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window