STEYNING DOWNLAND SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Engaging local people, and young people in particular, in enhancing the natural beauty of the surroundings for the benefit of the community, the land and its wildlife, including conservation research and work, community events, education and recreation opportunities, volunteer groups, participation of local community, particularly young people, in decision making and practical development work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETER JAMES BUTCHERS | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Lavery | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
MR GRAHAM BROAD | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Armitage | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|||||||||
RICHARD JOHN GORING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.35k | £55.78k | £38.80k | £72.55k | £51.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.98k | £36.89k | £37.58k | £55.28k | £41.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
3A TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND STUDY OF ALL MATTERS RELATING TO CONSERVATION AND THE ENVIRONMENT 3B TO ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL RESOURCES AND HABITATS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC 3C TO EDUCATE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC, AND LOCAL YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR, IN AN UNDERSTANDING OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT 3D IN THE CONTEXT OF THE OBJECTS IN CLAUSES 3A TO 3C ABOVE TO WORK IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE MORAL PRINCIPLES AND THE SPIRIT OF LOVE THAT AUTHENTICATES THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN A MANNER WHICH DEMONSTRATES CHRISTIAN STEWARDSHIP OF THE ENVIRONMENT. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS 'CHRISTIAN FAITH' MEANS THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS REVEALED AND EXPRESSED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES OF BOTH OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS IN EACH CASE IN THE AREA OF EAST AND WEST SUSSEX AND THE CITY OF BRIGHTONN
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF EAST AND WEST SUSSEX AND THE CITY OF BRIGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Steyning Downland Scheme
53 High Street
Steyning
West Sussex
BN44 3RE
- Phone:
- 01903817996
- Email:
- SDS@wistonestate.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window