BAITUL MUKARRAM JAME MASJID AND ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the trust as set out in its governing document is to advance the religion of Islam and Islamic Culture. The charity's main objective is to provide a place of worship, and to promote Islamic education and training. The charity has continued successfully in achieving its objectives by improving the facilities for daily prayers and other religious ceremonies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

31 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 18 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
31 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abu sufian Abdulla | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
AMINUL HOQUE | Trustee | 08 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
AYUB KAMALI | Trustee | 08 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
AJMOL ALI | Trustee | 07 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ISMAIL MIAH | Trustee | 25 January 2015 |
|
|||||
SHEIKH ABDUL KAIUM | Trustee | 25 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOMIR ALI | Trustee | 25 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ABUL KALAM CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL AHAD | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHAKAT ALI | Trustee | 06 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYED ABUL FAZAL MOL IYAHIYA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED SUAB ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AFZALUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AZMALUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KADIR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL QUIYUM RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED NIZAMUL MULK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOZIR AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOSIB ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED IBRAHIM ULLAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUSSAIN AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOIM ULLAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHURAB ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDULKARIM MOHAMMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YAHYA UDDIN CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOBAROK ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HANNAN MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Afzol Miah | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MD MOBOSHIR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MD NOFIJUR RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MD SUNAFOR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.36k | £29.85k | £30.08k | £29.40k | £38.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.88k | £28.21k | £25.55k | £23.95k | £33.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 August 2022 | 560 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 19 August 2022 | 560 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN THE SHEFFIELD AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY HOLDING OF PRAYER CONGREGATIONS, JUMMAH, TARAWEEH, CELEBRATION OF THE TWO EID'S, LECTURES, SEMINARS AND MEETINGS FOR THE BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF ISLAM. 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF THE QURAN BY THE HOLDING OF CLASSES FOR THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY. 3.3 TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP, POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, GUIDANCE AND A COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
THE SHEFFIELD AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAITUL MUKARRAM JAME MASJID
362 LONDON ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S2 4NB
- Phone:
- 01142582280
- Email:
- Shokatalisjx@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window