Accounts and annual returns THE UNDY CHURCH AND COMMUNITY HALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1133437
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 March 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required