REMUS MEMORIAL HORSE SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE SANCTUARY AIMS TO:- PROVIDE LIFETIME HELP, CARE AND ATTENTION FOR HORSES, PONIES, DONKEYS AND OTHER LARGE ANIMALS. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PROPER CARE AND TREATMENT OF EQUINES. ADVISE OWNERS ON THE CARE OF THEIR ANIMALS. HELP TO FIGHT THE EVER INCREASING RISE IN CRUELTY TO ANIMALS AND CONTINUE TO WORK WITH OTHER SIMILAR MINDED ORGANISATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 16 March 2010: Standard registration
- 05 December 2011: Funds received from 297618 REMUS MEMORIAL HORSE SANCTUARY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUE BURTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Natalie Anne Walker | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert O'Connor | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Esme Joan Fordham | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £473.09k | £606.08k | £502.61k | £383.81k | £465.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £396.20k | £424.56k | £498.40k | £523.02k | £499.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £561.95k | £418.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £44.13k | £83.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £4 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £313.91k | £203.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £417.58k | £488.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £6.99k | £9.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £960 | £1.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/03/2010
Charitable objects
1 THE CARE AND ATTENTION OF EQUINES AND OTHER ANIMALS MADE VULNERABLE BY REASON OF OLD AGE, SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, NEGLECT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES. 2, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PROPER CARE AND TREATMENT OF EQUINES AND OTHER ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
REMUS MEMORIAL HORSE SANCTUARY
LITTLE FARM
BUTTSBURY
INGATESTONE
ESSEX
CM4 9NZ
- Phone:
- 01277356191
- Email:
- info@remussanctuary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window