ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF CLEVELAND

Charity Number: 1133547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Islamic Education Center for Children & Adults, Community Center, Place Of Worship Muslim Funeral Services

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £201,176
Total expenditure: £208,791

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hartlepool
  • Middlesbrough
  • Redcar And Cleveland
  • Stockton-on-tees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Jania Masjid Al-Madina (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mohammed Yaqub Chair 01 April 2020
None on record
Mohammed Aftab Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
HAJI JABER Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Najabat Ramzan Trustee 01 April 2014
Aapna Services Limited
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £162.54k £66.42k £129.12k £208.74k £201.18k
Total expenditure £113.08k £59.42k £114.00k £168.92k £208.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 18 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 19 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
133a Waterloo Road
MIDDLESBROUGH
Cleveland
TS1 3JB
Phone:
07939369199