WEST PENNINE MOORS METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Umbrella for the Methodist churches in the West Pennine Moors Methodist Circuit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

61 Trustee(s)
81 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
Governance
- BLACKBURN METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- WEST PENNINE MOORS METHODISTCIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
60 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip John Gough | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
John Bryan Lamb | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Murtagh | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JUNE LITTLEMORE | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lesley Dinham | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rumble | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Pearce Huggill | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Anthony Fairclough | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Sheila Parker | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Keith William Borwick | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Gunston | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr GJ Murali | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Pilkington | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Turner | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rumble | Trustee | 02 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Elizabeth Burn | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Simister | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret Saunders | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Young | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ALAN ISHERWOOD | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret Howarth | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elizabeth Anne Kirova | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Venables | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Higham | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL VENABLES | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fairclough | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Paul Turner | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR GEORGE GRIME | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
David Albert Foster | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Debra Prescott | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Moran | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bancroft BSc PGCE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Rowley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hodkinson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
David Stuttard | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carl Fairclough | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE PEDDIE | Trustee | 07 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN SCOTT FISH | Trustee | 07 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev JAMES HENDERSON | Trustee | 07 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE RUMBLE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY HEATON | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|||||
JACKIE LAMBERT | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL EDWARD RUMBLE | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA PILLING | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN PRESCOTT | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN PLUMMER | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEAN TAYLOR | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
HILARY PHYLLIS THOBURN | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARSDEN BIRTWISTLE | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SARAH WEAL | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID HAWORTH | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY CROOK | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTINE LEECH | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
REV T YOUNG | Trustee | 12 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE GREGORY | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA SCOTT BANCROFT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN PEEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS E PEEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £373.98k | £338.45k | £278.00k | £571.01k | £257.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £371.46k | £383.29k | £337.30k | £271.91k | £344.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £185 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £570.95k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £271.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 September 2022 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 September 2022 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED 4/7/12
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARIT0ABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Circuit Office
Antley Methodist Church
Blackburn Road
Accrington
Lancashire
BB5 0DE
- Phone:
- 07988 177525
- Email:
- wpmcircuit@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window