Financial history AMBLECOTE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1132641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £347.86k £292.31k £360.31k £352.86k £351.57k
Total expenditure £356.07k £305.71k £360.21k £397.18k £357.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.10k £8.45k N/A