Living Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Vision We are a church that is passionate about family, friendships, and finding our calling. This is a place to call home. It?s a place to get help, healing, and hope. To provide a place where the depressed, the hurting, and hopeless can come and find help. To be a place of family, community, and hope. To welcome the community with open arms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 11 November 2009: Standard registration
- 09 October 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 December 2012: Re-registered
- ABLAZE MINISTRY (Previous name)
- BREAKING BORDERS MISSION (Previous name)
- Living Christian Church (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuele ARU | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Grazia Gioia Mazzara | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Innocenzo Magri | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Saraceno | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Abouelaz | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
LUCIANA NIGERO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.08k | £63.25k | £62.67k | £79.52k | £144.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.02k | £31.10k | £53.52k | £78.13k | £148.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.36k | £2.45k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 26 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 2017 as amended on 20 Oct 2019 as amended on 28 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
3.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION'S ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE ORGANISATION IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Larkspur Court
Rectory Park Avenue
NORTHOLT
UB5 6WW
- Phone:
- 07588039451
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window