EDUCATION FOR INDIGENT GIRLS IN AFRICA (EFIG)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPONSORS THE EDUCATION OF POOR GIRLS IN NIGERIA (LAGOS,PORT HARCOURT AND ASABA) AND ACCRA IN GHANA BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 AND 18 YEARS. FEEDING, TRANSPORT AND HEALTH COSTS ARE PAID BY CHARITY. AFTER EDUCATION THE GIRLS ARE GIVEN FURTHER TRAINING IF NEEDED TO HELP GAIN EMPLOYMENT OR AID TO START UP A SMALL BUSINESS (EMPLOYMENT AND ENTERPRISES SCHEME). FUNDS ARE RAISED FOR THE ABOVE IN THE UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ealing
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 24 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISTAIR AKINLAMI ISAACS-SODEYE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Belinda McLaughlan | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Alice Mears | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bishop | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.89k | £7.51k | £6.15k | £5.33k | £4.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.15k | £10.22k | £1.84k | £2.30k | £4.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN AFRICA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY GIRLS (AGED 5-18) IN NIGERIA BY. A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
181 Castelnau
London
SW13 9ER
- Phone:
- 07737337347
- Email:
- alistairefig@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window