FAITH TO SHARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FAITH TO SHARE SUPPORTS AN INTERNATIONAL NETWORK OF 40 CHRISTIAN MISSION AGENCIES WORKING IN MANY COUNTRIES AROUND THE WORLD. WE ENABLE COLLABORATIVE MISSION, THE SHARING OF RESOURCES FOR MISSION AND THE GROWTH AND EMERGENCE OF NEW MOVEMENTS IN MISSION, ESPECIALLY IN ASIA, AFRICA AND LATIN AMERICA. AROUND 7,000 PEOPLE WORK IN MISSION THROUGH THE AGENCIES OF FAITH TO SHARE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Malaysia
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- United States
Governance
- 13 November 2009: Standard registration
- F2S (Working name)
- FAITH2SHARE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROBERT WILKES | Chair | 23 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Manik Anthony George Corea | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey William-Banquo Hahn | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Rosalee Velloso Ewell | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Seeton Wong | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Wangari Muguyi Ochieng | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ram Prasad Shrestha | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE SMITH | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN WESLEY | Trustee | 23 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.71k | £130.41k | £111.01k | £101.78k | £87.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.75k | £98.37k | £85.88k | £97.23k | £83.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE, FOR THE PUBLIC GOOD, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF THE FACILITATION OF COLLABORATIVE WORK BETWEEN EXISTING MISSION AGENCIES AND MOVEMENTS. (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN ANY COUNTRY, FOR THE PUBLIC GOOD, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF SUPPORTING AND RESOURCING NEW CHARITABLE MOVEMENTS AND AGENCIES OF CHRISTIAN MISSION.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Faith 2 Share
Watlington Road
Cowley
Oxford
OX4 6BZ
- Phone:
- 01865787441
- Email:
- f2s@faith2share.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window