THE C3 CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, THE WORSHIP OF GOD, THE PREACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL, THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES, THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,175,793
Donations and legacies | £1.90m | |
Charitable activities | £229.70k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £2.15k | |
Other | £44.41k |
Total expenditure:
£2,450,631
Raising funds | £6.35k | |
Charitable activities | £2.44m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.35k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.44m |
People

27 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 November 2009: Standard registration
- 21 February 2012: Funds received from 289337 CAMBRIDGE COMMUNITY CHURCH
- C3 (Working name)
- THE JOURNEY (Working name)
- C3 THE JOURNEY (Previous name)
- CAMBRIDGE COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Elisabeth Harvey | Chair | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Louise Stephens | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Doris Campbell | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Emilton Arthur Barzey | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy David Pilkington | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Stephen Manyeh Ansa-Addo | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
PETER JOHN GOODLIFFE | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
STEVEN ANDREW CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.89m | £1.81m | £1.97m | £2.02m | £2.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75m | £1.75m | £2.05m | £2.18m | £2.45m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £61.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.69m | £1.72m | £1.74m | £1.76m | £1.90m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £164.62k | £79.61k | £216.44k | £205.61k | £229.70k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.87k | £1.89k | £1.08k | £1.16k | £2.15k | |
|
Income - Other | £26.89k | £8.92k | £8.62k | £53.03k | £44.41k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £1.72m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.75m | £1.75m | £2.04m | £2.18m | £2.44m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £7.41k | £9.14k | £6.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £28.78k | £11.65k | £33.21k | £24.71k | £37.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £58.13k | £54.13k | £61.22k | £44.69k | £58.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.03m | £5.84m | £5.80m | £5.59m | £5.22m | |
|
Long-term investments | £100 | £100 | £100 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Other assets | £561.39k | £686.79k | £521.95k | £351.30k | £359.28k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.12m | £2.00m | £1.88m | £1.66m | £1.57m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/06/2009 as amended on 08 Oct 2018 as amended on 21 May 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.1.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The C3 Centre
2 Brooks Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 3HR
- Phone:
- 01223844415
- Email:
- hello@thec3.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window