Financial history THE HIVE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1132710
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £226.02k £230.97k £168.97k £135.99k £98.01k
Total expenditure £276.38k £324.40k £212.84k £135.08k £124.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £50.57k N/A N/A N/A