THE DICK WHITE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in veterinary medicine for the benefit of the public by providing or assisting in the provision of education, training and research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 18 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jane Heywood | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olivier Taeymans | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine White | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Neil Gorman | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Miller | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janette Frances Wade | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF RICHARD ANDREW STANLEY WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17k | £7.02k | £5.37k | £79.89k | £16.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.17k | £6.36k | £5.78k | £6.72k | £49.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 August 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION 15 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN VETERINARY MEDICINE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THE RESEARCH INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO ASSISTANCE TO STUDENTS OF VETERINARY MEDICINE AND RESEARCH INTO ANIMAL DISEASES, AND 2 TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL, CLINICAL OR OTHER SUPPORT TO SUCH ANIMAL WELFARE ORGANISATIONS OR PROJECTS WHICH ARE CONSIDERED CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STATION FARMHOUSE
LONDON ROAD
SIX MILE BOTTOM
NEWMARKET
CB8 0UH
- Phone:
- 01638590657
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window