Financial history ART GENE LIMITED

Charity number: 1135536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £311.18k £202.31k £298.64k £327.34k £476.48k
Total expenditure £282.71k £215.98k £232.66k £408.11k £359.73k
Income from government contracts N/A £4.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £155.43k £10.00k £95.76k £113.56k £258.96k