ASTRO BRAIN TUMOUR FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDING LOW-GRADE GLIOMA BRAIN TUMOUR RESEARCH AND SUPPORTING PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES VIA TWO ONLINE SUPPORT GROUPS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2010: Standard registration
- ASTRO FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Louise Phillips | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAWN SARA EMERTON | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neal Edward Blatherwick | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ARTHUR BURTON | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA SCRUTTON | Trustee | 08 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA RICKFORD | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARY BURTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.07k | £54.45k | £71.01k | £85.16k | £37.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.36k | £2.81k | £23.85k | £16.73k | £84.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/12/2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LOW GRADE GLIOMA (SLOW GROWING BRAIN TUMOUR) PARTICULARLY BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH PROJECTS INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF LOW GRADE GLIOMAS AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Eastgate
Holme next the Sea
Hunstanton
PE36 6LL
- Phone:
- 01485525279
- Email:
- treasurer@astrofund.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window