Financial history BRIDGEPOINT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1134525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £789.54k £3.37m £969 £127.48k £240.26k
Total expenditure £304.97k £2.83m £764.41k £180.95k £426.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £789.54k £3.37m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £258 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £304.97k £2.83m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A