BRIDGEPOINT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1134525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Bridgepoint Charitable Trust operates from its European base and supports charities located in countries where the Bridgepoint business has an office. The Trust focusses in particular on charities who specialise in education or the environment and where a donation from the Trust can make a meaningful difference.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £240,262
Total expenditure: £426,613

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • China
  • France
  • Germany
  • Italy
  • Luxembourg
  • Netherlands
  • Poland
  • Spain
  • Sweden
  • Turkey
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BRIDGEPOINT INSPIRE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES MURRAY Chair
None on record
Paul Koziarski Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Vanessa Delaage Trustee 13 December 2019
None on record
Christina Magnusson Trustee 13 December 2019
None on record
David Nicolson Trustee 06 July 2018
None on record
Benjamin Marten Trustee 23 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £789.54k £3.37m £969 £127.48k £240.26k
Total expenditure £304.97k £2.83m £764.41k £180.95k £426.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £789.54k £3.37m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £258 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £304.97k £2.83m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Marble Arch
LONDON
W1H 7EJ
Phone:
02070343500
Email:
No information available