Accounts and annual returns SHIPTON-UNDER-WYCHWOOD WILD GARDEN AND WOODS

Charity number: 1133334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 06 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 05 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required