GROUNDWORK EAST MIDLANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work towards a vision of a society of sustainable communities which are vibrant, healthy and safe, which respect the local and global environment and where individuals and enterprise prosper. Creating those sustainable communities means developing initiatives which cut across economics, social issues and the environment. Our work is diverse, but all of it helps to achieve our vision
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 14 December 2009: Standard registration
- 11 March 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11m | £986.10k | £202.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04m | £1.04m | £229.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.11m | £986.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £815.80k | £926.41k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.25k | £2.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £217.64k | £83.95k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 27 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 07 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 28 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 19 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 08 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 08 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
3.1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE EAST MIDLANDS REGION (THE AREA). 3.2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN OR WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE AREA. 3.3. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OF THE WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME WHERESOEVER. 3.4. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.4.1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; 3.4.2. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; 3.4.3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RE-TRAINING PARTICULARLY AMONGST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.4.4. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESSES; OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.4.5. THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORK SPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.4.6. THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 3.4.7. THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.4.8. THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3.4.9. THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.4.10. THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, AND THE PROMOTION AND MAINTENANCE OF SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS; 3.4.11. THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; 3.4.12. THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; 3.4.13. SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 3.5. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE AREA BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. 3.6. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN THIS ARTICLE AND IN ARTICLE 3.5 ABOVE MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS." 3.7. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES IN THE DIRECT FURTHERANCE OF THEIR OBJECTS (OR ANY ONE OF THEM) BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN THE ESTABLISHMENT, ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CHARITIES ANYWHERE IN THE AREA INCLUDING ASSISTANCE OF ALL TYPES IN CONNECTION WITH THE RAISING AND DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS. 3.8. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO LOCAL COMMUNITY BASED GROUPS ANYWHERE IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
THE EAST MIDLANDS REGION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window