BIBLE TRAINING CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity donated funds to assist with the funding of the Bible Training College staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Tanzania
Governance
- 15 March 2010: Standard registration
- 02 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.27k | £8.39k | £5.25k | £1.80k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.66k | £8.06k | £2.82k | £3.51k | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 18 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 29 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 03 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 12 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN TANZANIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS AT THE BIBLE TRAINING CENTRE TANZANIA, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR BIBLE EDUCATION AND THE TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN PENTECOSTAL PASTORS. 2 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE BIBLE AND PASTORAL EDUCATION OF IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS B PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION, TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION. 3 TO FUND STUDENT ACTIVITIES THAT WILL PROMOTE PUTTING CHRISTIAN VALUES INTO PRACTICE, TO HELP OTHERS IN SOCIETY, SUCH AS VISITING AND HELPING PEOPLE WHO ARE DISTRESSED, SICK OR DYING, OR PROVIDING FOOD AND SHELTER TO THE HOMELESS.
Area of benefit
TANZANIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window