A.C.E

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACE tackles inequality by addressing the urgent needs of the BME Jewish community during the cost-of-living crisis. ACE help disadvantaged young people improve their mental wellbeing by arranging projects & clubs of arts, day trips, weekends away, holiday camps and play schemes aimed at developing their skills, hidden talents and bringing out their full potential to become successful adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Hackney
- Haringey
Governance
- 20 January 2010: Standard registration
- ACTIVITIES FOR CULTURAL ENHANCEMENT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISAAC WERTHAIM | Chair | 05 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE STAR | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEAH WEISS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.14k | £52.71k | £62.01k | £92.44k | £54.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.47k | £50.08k | £54.98k | £77.41k | £43.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 2 TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND RECREATION. 3 TO TRAIN YOUNG PEOPLE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND ENHANCE THEIR PROSPECTS OF EMPLOYMENT AND SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO GROW UP TO BECOME USEFUL CITIZENS ABLE TO MAKE USEFUL CONTRIBUTIONS TO AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SOCIETY AND THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE. 4 THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES SUCH AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, PROVIDED THAT THEY ARE REGARDED AS CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Colberg Place
LONDON
N16 5RB
- Phone:
- 07503042537
- Email:
- ACE8211@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window