KILBURN OLDER VOICES EXCHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kilburn Older Voices Exchange advocates on behalf of older people in Kilburn and surrounding area on issues that people raise. Current projects include: road safety, road crossings, lack of public seating and toilets, home care standards, personal safety/fear of crime, promoting wellbeing. KOVE engages a diverse group of older people in its projects including community filming.www.kove.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Brent
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 11 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Miles | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Frances Eley | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Stuart | Trustee | 15 November 2014 |
|
|||||
PHYLLIS YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.12k | £30.66k | £21.34k | £43.22k | £16.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.23k | £25.71k | £23.10k | £26.25k | £26.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE ANY APPROPRIATE CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE OLDER PEOPLE (PEOPLE AGED FIFTY YEARS OR OLDER) IN KILBURN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND RAISE AWARENESS IN THE COMMUNITY OF TOPICS THAT IMPACT ON OLDER PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
KILBURN
Contact information
- Address:
-
54-56 Phoenix Road
Somers Town
NW1 1ES
- Phone:
- 07973845285
- Email:
- peter56nw@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window