THEATRE IN THE ROUGH FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Producing artistic works (writing, theatre, audio) by emerging creatives from the North West of England, supported by workshops and professional development programmes. The principal thematic focus is the intersection between arts and ecology, and making work that responds to a time of ecological emergency. The organisation produces work in forms and places to reach non-self-selecting audiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 11 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antony Martin | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Wright | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Lyon | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DOMINIC GOETZEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA STALKER GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £792 | £13.20k | £8.28k | £4.55k | £21.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £979 | £1.02k | £16.79k | £6.91k | £5.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PLAYWRIGHTS, INVOLVING THEM IN PROFESSIONAL PRODUCTIONS OF THEIR WORK AND DELIVERING STRUCTURED PROGRAMMES OF LEARNING, AS WELL AS THROUGH THE WIDER ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING, WITHOUT ANY LIMITATION, THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 New Street
Mawdesley
ORMSKIRK
L40 2QP
- Phone:
- 07710849243
- Email:
- info@theatreintherough.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window