BEACONSFIELD FREE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, ALSO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN EDUCATION AND PURSUE AND PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Kenya
Governance
- 01 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Burton | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KERRY LANE-SELLERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GINA LONGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.83k | £8.45k | £10.83k | £13.14k | £10.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.58k | £7.90k | £15.27k | £13.82k | £5.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES (ACTING ACCORDING TO THE WILL OF GOD AS DISCERNED BY THE CHURCH MEMBERS) FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES (ACTING AS AFORESAID) FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT: AND 3) TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN EDUCATION AND PURSUE AND PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONSISTENT WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES (ACTING AS AFORESAID) FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. ENTERTAINMENT INDUSTRY AND SOCIAL AND BUSINESS SKILLS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Burroughs Crescent
BOURNE END
Buckinghamshire
SL8 5NR
- Phone:
- 01494534354
- Email:
- hsburton1993@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window