Financial history BARROW TRANSPORT MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1134602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.18k £38.52k £36.48k £61.37k £54.18k
Total expenditure £49.84k £35.97k £42.89k £57.94k £50.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.50k N/A N/A N/A