DAPPER SNAPPER CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
swimming and water related sports
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 February 2010: Standard registration
- 03 February 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 28 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH DOWNS SYNDROME OR WHO HAVE DISABILITIES OR OTHER SPECIAL NEEDS BY THE TEACHING OF SWIMMING AND OTHER WATER RELATED ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window