ALL PAKISTAN WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
July 5th 2010 The charity was launched at the House of Lords through the kind Patronage of Baroness Flather and Chief Guest was the Lord Speaker Baroness Hayman. The Charity reflects Pakistani women of the United Kingdom and that our Friends For Life should be women of Pakistani origin as well as women of other nationalities who have an affinity for Pakistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Pakistan
Governance
- 19 May 2010: Standard registration
- THE UK ALL PAKISTAN WOMENS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Seemi Saeed Awan | Chair | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIRAN ALI | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samia Ali | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nausheen Ahmed | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Memona Baig | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.08k | £18.32k | £24.99k | £24.69k | £19.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.78k | £17.77k | £23.46k | £21.23k | £20.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 11 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED ON 27/01/2015 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
1 TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND PROMOTE THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL, SEXUAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF PAKISTANI WOMEN IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD 2 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PAKISTANI WOMEN AND MEN IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PAKISTANI WOMEN IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD 4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO ECONOMIC CONDITIONS, THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF PAKISTANI WOMEN AND MATTERS RELATING TO EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PAKISTANI WOMEN AND MEN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Laurel Way
South Woodford
London
E18 2UA
- Phone:
- 07950049988
- Email:
- seemi@apwa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window