THE AMEN CORNER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 18 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARTH THERON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James David Ralph Buchanan | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARK SHAND | Trustee | 02 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN FINLAY HERON LAWES | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANET KATHLEEN IRWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.67k | £47.35k | £50.06k | £46.80k | £43.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.10k | £632 | £12.12k | £64.10k | £95 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 OCTOBER 2009 as amended on 25 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") (I) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLD-WIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STATEMENT APPEARING IN SCHEDULE 1 HEREOF
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLD-WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
192 SOUTHCROFT ROAD
LONDON
SW17 9TW
- Phone:
- 02086728921
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window