Accounts and annual returns NORTH KENT DISABLED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1133901
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2013 09 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 09 December 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2012 21 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 21 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2011 18 September 2012 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 19 December 2011 On Time