ANA LEAF FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the preservation of health anywhere in the world, the promotion of medical research anywhere in the world, the advancement of education and education facilities, such other charitable purposes according to the laws of England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA CATHERINE SIMMONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAYLEY DE PUTRON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £502.50k | £502.50k | £2.50k | £4.00m | £101.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £561.69k | £432.66k | £160.39k | £575.43k | £1.40m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £500.00k | £500.00k | N/A | £4.00m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £2.50k | £2.50k | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £529.63k | £401.80k | N/A | £535.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.10k | £7.30k | N/A | £7.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £444.45k | £350.87k | N/A | £426.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £32.05k | £30.86k | N/A | £40.08k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH ANYWHERE IN THE WORD AND IN PARTICULAR AMONG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND THE CHANNEL ISLANDS; (B) THE PROMOTION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR THE SUPPORT OF RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING HEALTH; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR AMONG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND THE CHANNEL ISLANDS; AND (D) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 155
JERSEY
JE45NS
- Phone:
- 07797892310
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window