UPPER THAMES METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing opportunity for members of the public and members of The Methodist Church to worship and share their christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church The provision of sacred space for prayer and contemplation Involved with projects within the community Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas financially and with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
- Oxfordshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Shirlyn Toppin | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Dowling | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADAM VINCENT LONGHURST | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Joseph Samuel Ribeiro | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Eileen Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Mullin | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN YOUE | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Annette Culling | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Timothy Phoenix-Stone | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter McAuley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Hazel Laura Elizabeth Garnell | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Roberts | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Frederick Dowling | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia June Freemantle | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Catherine Simpson | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Adrian John German | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart DIXON | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARIAN CLITHEROE | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ann Louise Phoenix-Stone | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Duncan Brodie | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH GERALDINE COOPER | Trustee | 05 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ANTHONY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.66k | £217.06k | £399.65k | £144.95k | £126.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.62k | £260.31k | £283.03k | £166.65k | £269.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Garraways
Royal Wootton Bassett
SWINDON
SN4 8LT
- Phone:
- 01793 849241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window