EMMANUEL CHURCH (SALISBURY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship Services on the Lord's Day; mid-week meetings for Bible study and prayer, open air preaching meetings; door-to-door distribution of Christian literature; evangelistic youth meetings. Public meetings on matters such as Biblical Christian living. Wedding and Funeral services. The trustees have had regard to the guidance issued by the Charity Commission on public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 February 2010: Standard registration
- Salisbury Emmanuel (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Peter Thackway | Chair | 18 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Jonathan Charles Bristow | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Nathanial Peter Bravery | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicholas Tribe | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas James Wheatley | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Philip Woodger | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Robert Pike | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD JOHN WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PAUL EDWARD THICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
KEITH GREWCOCK | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
COLIN JOHN MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.97k | £131.76k | £132.53k | £155.92k | £150.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.01k | £136.23k | £99.07k | £182.90k | £136.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, THE GLORY OF GOD, THE NURTURE OF GOD'S PROFESSING PEOPLE AND THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ACCORDING TO EVANGELICAL, REFORMED, AND BAPTISTIC PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHURCH'S STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE CHURCH CONSTITUTION AND AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1 OF THIS LEGAL CONSTITUTION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD, AS WARRANTED BY GOD'S WORD.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
EMMANUEL CHURCH
8 WILTON ROAD
SALISBURY
SP2 7EE
- Phone:
- 01722504637
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window