PRIDE OF SEFTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We Cruise the Leeds Liverpool Canal and enjoy trips through the Iconic Liverpool Link, we only have one boat, but hopefully in the near future we will have Pride 3 and more trips arranged. We continue to work with C&RT and local schools, we also continue to support groups in their fund raising. 2014 seen us take part in "Barging round Britain" with John Sergeant screened in April 2015.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 07 April 2011: Standard registration
- 10 January 2012: Funds received from 511511 THE SEFTON NARROW BOAT COMMITTEE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES BRETT | Chair | 21 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Chris Walker | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
William McGarry | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.94k | £52.21k | £48.21k | £25.69k | £48.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.81k | £64.65k | £53.47k | £41.51k | £54.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 JUL 2016 as amended on 04 Nov 2020 as amended on 11 Feb 2021 as amended on 31 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
The objects of the Company shall be the acquisition and preservation of one or more canal craft for use for: 4.1 the advancement of education in particular, but not exclusively, the education and support of those in poverty, homeless and disabled persons; and 4.2 the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation or other leisure time for persons living in the Liverpool City Region by providing a narrowboat or other suitable boat, such persons having need of those facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, poverty or social economic circumstances. 4.3 Article 4 may be amended by special resolution but only with the prior written consent of the Commission.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Sovini Group
PO Box 891
ORPINGTON
Bromley
BR6 1LY
- Phone:
- 01515305571
- Email:
- PrideofSefton@sovini.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window