EVOLUTION ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Courses and workshops in arts,crafts, health and well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Martin Stretton | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ronald Louis Gower | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN LINNEY MPHIL | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.55k | £156.10k | £92.89k | £53.29k | £54.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.57k | £150.00k | £93.32k | £53.66k | £64.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £46.04k | £34.45k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS; 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN RELATION TO MATTERS OF HEALTH; AND 3.3 TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH THROUGH THE DISPENSATION OF ALTERNATIVE FORMS OF HEALTH TREATMENT TO INCLUDE BUT NOT LIMITED TO ACUPUNCTURE, AROMATHERAPY, ALEXANDER TECHNIQUE, OSTEOPATHY, COUNSELLING, HOMEOPATHY, SHIATSU, TOGETHER WITH OTHER ALTERNATIVE FORMS OF HEALTH EXERCISES AND TREATMENTS INCLUDING YOGA AND TAI CHI.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Evolution Arts
17 Tichborne Street
BRIGHTON
BN1 1UR
- Phone:
- 01273204204
- Email:
- info@evolutionarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window