Trustees REDCAR UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 1133195

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Jane Carr | Chair | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey-Jo Samantha Gray | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Gordon Mogg | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Beverley Ann McReynolds | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Esplin | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Biondi | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.