PROTECTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN PUBLIC LAW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Monitoring abuses of human rights and obtaining redress for victims 2. Research into human rights issues 3. Providing technical advice to government, corporations, organisations and others on human rights matters 4. Contributing to the sound administration of human rights law 5. Raising awareness of human rights issues
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 2010: Standard registration
- PROTECTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN PUBLIC LAW AND AGAINST REGULATORY AND AUTHORITATIVE BODIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Khubaib Malik | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Malik | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Usman Shahid | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.31k | £171.17k | £118.72k | £88.70k | £104.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.44k | £153.60k | £91.74k | £91.74k | £99.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 MAY 2010. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS; = MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; = OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; = RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE: = RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; = PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; = CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; = RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; = PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; = PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS;
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
PHRPL
City View House
5 Union Street
Ardwick
MANCHESTER
M12 4JD
- Phone:
- 01612246437
- Email:
- info@phrpl.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window