NATIONAL FOREST EAST METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National Forest East Methodist Circuit was formerly known as the Ashby & Coalville Methodist Circuit; it was renamed when it amalgamated with the adjoining Castle Donington Circuit in September 2012. The Circuit comprises 13 local Methodist churches and fellowships serving the area's towns and villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

42 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 January 2010: Standard registration
- ASHBY AND COALVILLE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
42 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY MONICA HAYWOOD | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Robert Hawkins | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicola Geeson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Dawn Bishop | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Hawkins | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Stent | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kay Jeffries | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Stevenson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Lee | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Arthur Allsop | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Allsop | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jane Missenden | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANN CHADWIN | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Joy Dale | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Louise Elizabeth Morrissey | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNA DRAPER | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Snelson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Kenneth Snelson | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Henry Stent | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Dean Hudson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Pickering | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bennett | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steven David Draper | Trustee | 19 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Janet Myles | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE BROMELL | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|||||
LINDA ANNE BUESNEL | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PIERS BUESNEL | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RUTTER | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Arthur Haywood | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|||||
LINDA MARGARET FRANCIS | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev DENNIS HENRY JAMES SMITH | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA WILSON | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK DALE | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SHIRLEY GOODENOUGH | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW WILLIAM LEE | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JAMESON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN AUBREY STANTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN WHITMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARY HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD JOHN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN LLOYD PEACE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH JANE CHADWICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.40k | £216.43k | £259.20k | £230.87k | £441.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £328.85k | £290.56k | £377.94k | £646.59k | £497.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
376 Hall Lane
Whitwick
COALVILLE
Leicestershire
LE67 5PF
- Phone:
- 01530 587251
- Email:
- nfe.circuit@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window