LIVING WATER AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LWA funds and manages Water and Sanitation projects in Africa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Sierra Leone
- Uganda
Governance
- 15 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PAUL VERSCHUEREN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
HELEN MACFARLANE | Trustee | 13 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARA MARIE PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE VERSCHUEREN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JOHN ALEXANDER BONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLETTE FRANCES MARY BONE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.92k | £10.51k | £7.34k | £7.31k | £7.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.40k | £0 | £7.50k | £12.53k | £10.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 21 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES, AND ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED AND CONCERNED WITH THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POVERTY AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING SAFE DRINKING WATER, SAFE SANITATION AND EDUCATION IN WATER HYGIENE IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Hawthorn Drive
CROWTHORNE
Berkshire
RG45 6UB
- Phone:
- 07484873474
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window