VALE OF AYLESBURY CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circuit produces a quarterly preaching planto ensure regular acts of worship take place in each of the 18 Methodist Churches and Local Ecumenical partnerships in its geographical area. These are open to all people without charge. The Circuit is directly involved in plans to provide a Town Center Chaplain service for Aylesbury and support to the new housing developments in the Aylesbury area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

59 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 10 February 2010: Standard registration
- AYLESBURY VALE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
59 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard James Atkinson | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Chris Webb | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Gannon | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hee-Gon Moon | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Cotton | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Humphreys | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Craft | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Violet Walker | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Trout | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Noreen Daley-Lee | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Sara | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Wright | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Alderman | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Shaw | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Des Quinn | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Doughlin | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jane Atkinson | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maguire | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gibbs | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ROSAMUND MARKS | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Lynn Yvonne Bernstone | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alfred George Rogers | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary shurlock | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Honeyball | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Munro Kemp | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Wells | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mariner-Kyle | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Banham | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rena Margaret Stevens | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Pullen | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith Edward William Wallace | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
PETE HONEYBALL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Hill | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Francis Fisher | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Whiteway | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
COLIN WATTS | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR R THORPE | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Orr | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Margaret Hart | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT EDWARD EARL | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOY MURPHY | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|||||
Barbara Yvonne Warne | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony William Howells | Trustee | 25 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Watts | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
jennifer Mary Bullimore | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ALAN KIRK | Trustee | 01 August 2010 |
|
|||||
KEVIN BRUCE HARDERN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ARTHUR SARA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROGER WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM GORDON COTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN STORER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH MARY WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER LAURA STUCHBURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNETH JAMES HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN NEVILLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALBERT BARTON ODRO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSANNE JANE SPINKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL MICHAEL INGRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALLEN HEFFER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.51k | £247.11k | £272.30k | £270.86k | £282.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.86k | £227.20k | £242.19k | £231.36k | £273.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)" AS AMENDED 1 SEPT 2010.
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 HERSTON CLOSE
AYLESBURY
HP21 9UR
- Phone:
- 01296 339899
- Email:
- revrja@outlook.com
- Website:
-
aylesburyvale.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window