TANAKA UK JAPAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN JAPAN, THE UK AND OTHER ENGLISH SPEAKING COUNTRIES BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION OR FINANCIAL SUPPORT (INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING MAKING GRANTS BURSARIES OR SCHOLARSHIPS) TO THE PROVIDERS OF EDUCATION OR STUDENTS UNDERTAKING STUDIES IN THE JAPANESE OR ENGLISH LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, CULTURE, ARTS OR SCIENCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 02 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Janes | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Takeshi Ueshima | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Fumiko Danno | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAKIKO UESHIMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.31k | £207.73k | £236.39k | £280.42k | £292.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.51k | £105.06k | £36.50k | £518.95k | £32.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 JULY 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 6 AUGUST 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN JAPAN, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER ENGLISH SPEAKING COUNTRIES BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION OR FINANCIAL SUPPORT (INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING MAKING GRANTS BURSARIES OR SCHOLARSHIPS) TO THE PROVIDERS OF EDUCATION OR STUDENTS UNDERTAKING STUDIES IN EITHER THE JAPANESE OR ENGLISH LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, CULTURE, ARTS OR SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
JAPAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
711 Fifth Avenue 16th Floor
New York
United States
NY10022
- Phone:
- 02079695500
- Email:
- tu@hfmny.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window