THE MALDON MUD RACE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding a yearly race across the river Blackwater starting and finishing at The Promenade Park Maldon Essex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 15 April 2010: Standard registration
- THE MALDON MUD RACE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Pipe | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rhiain Oakley | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Charles Lodge | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Weller | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROY LESLIE HEMSWORTH | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN FARRINGTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
COLIN MCINTOSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.21k | £7.76k | £4.18k | £37.94k | £67.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.88k | £7.59k | £4.63k | £47.28k | £37.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 December 2020 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 14 December 2020 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 2009 as amended on 21 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 2 The Reach
687-693 London Road
Westcliffe On Sea
Essex
SS0 9PA
- Phone:
- 07939255169
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window