NEWARK AND SOUTHWELL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money for running local churches and provide funds for outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

43 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
- India
- Malawi
Governance
- 12 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
43 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nathan Falla | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janice Carol Wright | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Derek Trowbridge | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin William Jackson | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Haydn Dando | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD CHARLES ADAMS | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Winnington | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Linda Swinney | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ward | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mary Wood | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jill Suter | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul James Fairfax | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Barrie Morley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Mary Blundy Lyn | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Peterson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Meakin | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Louise Everett | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Hibberts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ROSEMARY HARDY | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Silver | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Swift | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus James Silver | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Margaret Dalby | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Gascoyne | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Pepper | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Patricia Boneham | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raymond George Atkinson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Watson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Beech | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANN JACQUELINE YEOMANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL STROWGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN GODFREY PETER MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSALYN ANN BEASLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CLIFFORD WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE ANNE PIKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY KENNETH AYERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM WALTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT OWEN YEOMANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE WALTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN ALISON DANDO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MEL WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.17k | £316.04k | £173.30k | £162.87k | £470.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.02k | £254.33k | £208.63k | £267.26k | £343.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 August 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 August 2022 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 December 2021 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIRCUIT OFFICE
15A BARNBY GATE
NEWARK
NG24 1PX
- Phone:
- 07768525086
- Email:
- nsmccircuit@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window