THE FARAWAY CHILDRENS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Initial Short term service provision objectives for the charity are to distribute diverse resources to needy children and young people and to develop a bank of sustainable gifts to distribute to children and young people at Christmas & Easter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 29 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE MARGARET DEAMER | Chair | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ann-Marie Prendiville | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Doherty | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sherlock | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Walsh | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Hardy | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.35k | £25.56k | £25.56k | £18.25k | £30.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.76k | £15.66k | £15.66k | £20.27k | £31.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE VULNERABLE, DISADVANTAGED, LIVING IN POVERTY OR UNSAFE CONDITIONS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Tyler Court
Shepshed
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 9SJ
- Phone:
- 07495 539611
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window