THE DERBY HIPPODROME RESTORATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To restore the Hippodrome Theatre, Derby, a Grade II listed building, such that it can make a major contribution to the cultural life of Derby.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derby City
Governance
- 02 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOAN FRANCES TRAVIS | Chair | 02 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Digby Bown | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jannice Read | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|||||
MR P J STEER | Trustee | 02 September 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.38k | £13.26k | £4.61k | £620 | £6.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.16k | £1.60k | £19.21k | £336 | £6.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF DERBY AND OF THE NATION, THE HISTORIC ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND DERBY IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST AND IN PARTICULAR THE BUILDING KNOWN AS THE HIPPODROME THEATRE DERBY.
Area of benefit
DERBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 FORD LANE
ALLESTREE
DERBY
DE22 2EY
- Phone:
- 01332557096
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window