METHODIST CHURCH SOUTHEND AND LEIGH CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Circuit is the administrative body for the seventeen Methodist Churches in the Southend and Leigh Circuit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£591,107
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £185.70k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £12.95k | |
Other | £392.45k |
Total expenditure:
£542,147
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £542.15k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £542.15k | |
Retained for future use | £48.96k |
People

10 Employee(s)
45 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 10 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
45 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Moorhouse | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Norton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Valerie Ryall | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Anne Sains | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Steve Watson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Heather Simmons | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Donald Mayes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Claire Gunn | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN ALLUM | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Fulford | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
GABRIELLE GREENWAY | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Roger Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Zena Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
William Frank Edmonds | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Agnes Sam | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Deacon Sarah McDowall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Simms | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Wornell | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MURIEL PREGNALL | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Merenda | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Stephen Mayo | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JUDITH TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||||
Linda King | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Turner | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Bruce Glendenning | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLE GLENDENNING | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Coombes | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL SPAULL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
VIVIEN ROBSON BA HONS | Trustee | 05 August 2014 |
|
|||||||
JUDEE PETERSON | Trustee | 20 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN SAMBRIDGE | Trustee | 28 June 2014 |
|
|
||||||
LAWRENCE WARD | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
TINA GOWERS | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE SHEILA DOBBIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EVA MARY HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
NEELTJE CHARLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROBERT BRIANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev MARGARET DEANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANNE DOREEN LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANNE BRIANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
KEITH NORMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
IAN LOWE BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MARGARET JOAN POULTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £445.36k | £405.14k | £392.94k | £507.20k | £591.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £420.88k | £422.36k | £534.34k | £514.37k | £542.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £185.70k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.97k | £12.95k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £498.23k | £392.45k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £542.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £514.37k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.24m | £2.24m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £365.79k | £414.65k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £56.16k | £56.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highlands Methodist Church
Sutherland Boulevard
LEIGH-ON-SEA
SS9 3PT
- Phone:
- 01702479476
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window