HARDSHAW AND MANN AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Hardshaw and Mann Area Meeting is the furtherance of the general religious and charitable purposes of the Religious Society of Friends (Quakers) in Britain in the area of Hardshaw and Mann Area Meeting and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wigan
- Isle Of Man
Governance
- 25 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 September 2012: Re-registered
- 05 May 2021: Funds received from 238518 HARDSHAW WEST MONTHLY MEETING CHARITIES
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Dawn Gibbs | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Liese Lottie Van Alwon | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eric James Silk | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jai James Brierley | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shanthini Cawson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £355.58k | £165.43k | £213.45k | £278.20k | £357.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.02k | £187.19k | £187.82k | £258.42k | £284.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.49k | £57.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 2009 as amended on 15 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA OF THE HARDSHAW AND MANN MEETING AND BEYOND
Area of benefit
HARDSHAW AND MANN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quakers Meeting House
22 School Lane
Liverpool
L1 3BT
- Phone:
- 0151 709 6957
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window